Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2402 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 18014 Week
» 116659 Month
» 319323 Year
» 3346176 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5609 |
21/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31186 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/6) |
31601 |
23/03/1999 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
21/04/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
22/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
22/11/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Cinders from steam locomotives |
Not known |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5609 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
22/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31186 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
23/03/1999 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31601 |
|
|