Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14886 Week
» 67902 Month
» 187429 Year
» 3214282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5604 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
228 |
To Service |
During 01/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/11/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5604 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
13/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5604 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|