Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 260 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14303 Week
» 79257 Month
» 281921 Year
» 3308774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5601 |
24/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31180 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
11/06/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/06/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5601 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/06/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31180 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31180 |
|
|
06/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|