Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1920 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19723 Week
» 72739 Month
» 192266 Year
» 3219119 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5595 |
03/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31175 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/03/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
12/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/12/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/03/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5595 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
12/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31175 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31175 |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Kingmoor MPD |
|
|