Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1215 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14621 Week
» 67637 Month
» 187164 Year
» 3214017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5594 |
03/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31174 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/03/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/09/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
30/04/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
30/04/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5594 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MC) |
|
|
30/04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31174 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
07/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|