Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1476 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19279 Week
» 72295 Month
» 191822 Year
» 3218675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5593 |
25/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31173 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
25/02/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/11/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
23/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
23/05/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5593 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
30/11/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
23/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31173 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
14/04/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31173 |
|
|
09/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|