Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 262 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6046 Week
» 27435 Month
» 146962 Year
» 3173815 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5581 |
14/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31163 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
14/01/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
07/08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/08/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/02/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5581 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31163 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
19/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31163 |
|
|
03/2000 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|