Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1862 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19665 Week
» 72681 Month
» 192208 Year
» 3219061 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5577 |
31/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31159 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
31/12/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/08/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/08/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5577 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31159 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
28/08/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
06/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|
12/06/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31159 |
|
|