Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1730 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19533 Week
» 72549 Month
» 192076 Year
» 3218929 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5575 |
23/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31157 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31424 |
01/1975 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31524 |
30/05/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/12/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5575 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31157 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31424 |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/05/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31524 |
|
|
01/05/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31524 |
|
|
08/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|