Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 440 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18243 Week
» 71259 Month
» 190786 Year
» 3217639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5573 |
17/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31155 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/12/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/03/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/03/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
07/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
19/04/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5573 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31155 |
|
|
11/03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
26/05/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31155 |
|
|
09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|