22/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5558 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
13/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31140 |
|
|
17/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31421 |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/03/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31421 |
|
|
08/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|