Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5545 |
08/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31127 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
08/10/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
14/10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5545 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31127 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
21/06/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31127 |
|
|
12/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|