Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5540 |
16/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31122 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/07/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1980 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5540 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
02/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
30/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31122 |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
22/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31122 |
|
|
08/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Stratford MPD |
|
|