Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3043 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16449 Week
» 69465 Month
» 188992 Year
» 3215845 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5534 |
11/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31116 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/06/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
09/03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
30/11/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
07/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
14/07/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
30/11/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
07/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
14/07/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
26/03/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5534 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31116 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
14/07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/02/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31116 |
|
|
07/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|