Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 559 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6343 Week
» 27732 Month
» 147259 Year
» 3174112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5533 |
04/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31115 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31466 |
10/03/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
04/06/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5533 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31115 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
10/03/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31466 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/02/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31466 |
|
|