Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2919 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33569 Week
» 132214 Month
» 334878 Year
» 3361731 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5528 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
251 |
To Service |
During 05/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/11/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5528 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yatton (spm) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
16/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5528 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|