Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3226 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16632 Week
» 69648 Month
» 189175 Year
» 3216028 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5527 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
251 |
To Service |
During 05/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/06/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5527 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
20/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5527 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|