Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5527 |
23/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31109 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/04/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
13/02/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/02/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/08/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5527 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
03/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31109 |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
18/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31109 |
|
|
08/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|