Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 358 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6142 Week
» 27531 Month
» 147058 Year
» 3173911 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5526 |
16/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31108 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
16/04/1959 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
27/09/1991 |
Time in Service |
32 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
18/07/1995 |
Information |
Disc Indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/04/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5526 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31108 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
27/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31108 |
|
|
18/07/1995 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|