Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2028 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15434 Week
» 68450 Month
» 187977 Year
» 3214830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5524 |
26/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31106 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
26/03/1959 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1995 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Information |
Disc Indicators |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/03/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
01/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5524 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
25/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31106 |
|
|
16/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/11/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31106 |
|
|