Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1323 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7107 Week
» 28496 Month
» 148023 Year
» 3174876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5518 |
16/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31101 |
02/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
16/10/1958 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
11/01/1993 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
17/03/1994 |
Information |
Disc Indicators. Involved in a collision in 1967 and was rebuilt as a class 31/1 using parts from D5658. This included 4-digit route indicators and electro-pneumatic control gear. |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/10/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/08/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
04/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/10/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1977 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5518 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/08/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31101 |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/01/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31101 |
|
|
17/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|