Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 795 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14201 Week
» 67217 Month
» 186744 Year
» 3213597 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5516 |
04/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31016 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
04/09/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/01/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5516 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31016 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31016 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|