Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2096 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16139 Week
» 81093 Month
» 283757 Year
» 3310610 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5514 |
24/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31014 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968015 |
07/1977 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/07/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/12/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/07/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/07/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5514 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31014 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/11/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31014 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968015 |
|
|
06/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|