Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1339 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19142 Week
» 72158 Month
» 191685 Year
» 3218538 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5508 |
17/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31008 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968016 |
05/10/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/04/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/10/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/04/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5508 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31008 |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31008 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/10/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968016 |
|
|
06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|