Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2456 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15862 Week
» 68878 Month
» 188405 Year
» 3215258 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5501 |
25/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31001 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
25/11/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/02/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1957 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
07/07/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5501 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
27/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31001 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31001 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|