Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1247 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7031 Week
» 28420 Month
» 147947 Year
» 3174800 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5500 |
10/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31018 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
10/10/1957 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
10/07/1976 off Stratford (SF) |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Surplus, condition |
Time in Service |
18 yrs , 9 mths |
Cut Up |
10/07/1976 |
Information |
Disc Indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
10/10/1957 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/03/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/10/1957 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5500 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31018 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31018 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|