Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2623 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13838 Week
» 4894 Month
» 351318 Year
» 3378171 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5419 |
m/e |
06/1932 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
54xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
277 |
To Service |
During 06/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/02/1958 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1932 |
WES |
|
Westbury |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/02/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5419 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westbury (WES) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5419 |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|