Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1141 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18944 Week
» 71960 Month
» 191487 Year
» 3218340 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5412 |
03/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27124 |
06/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/2) |
27206 |
20/07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
03/09/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Light engine |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5412 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27124 |
|
|
20/07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27206 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
01/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27206 |
|
|
09/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|