Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 679 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6463 Week
» 27852 Month
» 147379 Year
» 3174232 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5410 |
30/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27123 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/2) |
27205 |
14/12/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27059 |
25/02/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
30/08/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1974 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5410 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27123 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
14/12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27205 |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
25/02/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27059 |
|
|
01/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27059 |
|
|