Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5409 |
10/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27116 |
03/1973 |
|
TOPS (27/2) |
27210 |
06/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27064 |
24/08/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
10/08/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5409 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27116 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27210 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
24/08/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27064 |
|
|
01/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27064 |
|
|
08/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|