Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18704 Week
» 71720 Month
» 191247 Year
» 3218100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5403 |
17/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27122 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/2) |
27204 |
19/04/1975 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27058 |
05/03/1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
17/07/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5403 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27122 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
19/04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27204 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
05/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27058 |
|
|
01/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27058 |
|
|
08/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|