Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15058 Week
» 68074 Month
» 187601 Year
» 3214454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5402 |
12/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27040 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
12/07/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/03/1970 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5402 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27040 |
|
|
27/01/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27040 |
|
|
04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard |
|
|