Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 350 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6134 Week
» 27523 Month
» 147050 Year
» 3173903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5401 |
10/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27112 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27056 |
08/08/1982 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
10/07/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5401 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27112 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
08/08/1982 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27056 |
|
|
01/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27056 |
|
|