Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 374 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18177 Week
» 71193 Month
» 190720 Year
» 3217573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5387 |
21/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27104 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27048 |
01/09/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
21/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5387 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27104 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/09/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27048 |
|
|
01/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27048 |
|
|
09/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|