Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 501 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6285 Week
» 27674 Month
» 147201 Year
» 3174054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5386 |
18/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27103 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/2) |
27212 |
15/03/1975 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27066 |
05/11/1982 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
18/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5386 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27103 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/03/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27212 |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: ETH equipment isolated |
|
|
05/11/1982 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27066 |
|
|
01/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27066 |
|
|