Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 681 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18484 Week
» 71500 Month
» 191027 Year
» 3217880 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5374 |
07/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27101 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27045 |
10/09/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
07/02/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/02/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5374 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27101 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
10/09/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27045 |
|
|
01/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27045 |
|
|
01/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|