Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2157 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15563 Week
» 68579 Month
» 188106 Year
» 3214959 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5371 |
29/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27025 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
29/01/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/01/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5371 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) (On Loan) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27025 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
18/06/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27025 |
|
|
03/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|