Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 467 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14510 Week
» 79464 Month
» 282128 Year
» 3308981 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5367 |
04/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27021 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1970 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
65A |
|
Eastfield (New) |
on |
04/01/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/06/1985 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/02/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5367 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27021 |
|
|
03/06/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27021 |
|
|
30/04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard |
|
|