Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1554 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7338 Week
» 28727 Month
» 148254 Year
» 3175107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5353 |
13/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27007 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
13/09/1961 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
65A |
|
Eastfield (New) |
on |
13/09/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/01/1985 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/09/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5353 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number DEL196 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27007 |
|
|
28/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27007 |
|
|
30/09/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|