Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 535 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6319 Week
» 27708 Month
» 147235 Year
» 3174088 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5343 |
02/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26043 |
01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
02/10/1959 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
19/01/1993 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
12/12/1994 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
02/10/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5343 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26043 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
19/01/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26043 |
|
|
12/12/1994 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|