Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 375 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6159 Week
» 27548 Month
» 147075 Year
» 3173928 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5340 |
11/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26040 |
10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
11/09/1959 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
04/12/1992 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
19/12/1994 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
11/09/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5340 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26040 |
|
|
04/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26040 |
|
|
19/12/1994 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|