Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1174 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6958 Week
» 28347 Month
» 147874 Year
» 3174727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5338 |
28/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26038 |
07/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
28/08/1959 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
19/10/1992 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
28/08/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 08/1976 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 08/1976 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
07/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5338 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26038 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
19/10/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26038 |
|
|