Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3335 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29369 Week
» 128014 Month
» 330678 Year
» 3357531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5337 |
20/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26037 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
20/08/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/11/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5337 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26037 |
|
|
04/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26037 |
|
|
02/02/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|