Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1183 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18986 Week
» 72002 Month
» 191529 Year
» 3218382 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5335 |
24/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26035 |
01/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
24/07/1959 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
10/12/1992 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
24/07/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 10/1975 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1975 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/12/1962 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5335 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26035 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26035 |
|
|