Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4926 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20538 Week
» 119183 Month
» 321847 Year
» 3348700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5313 |
23/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26013 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
23/01/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
15/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5313 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26013 |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
18/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26013 |
|
|
30/06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|