Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 399 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6183 Week
» 27572 Month
» 147099 Year
» 3173952 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5310 |
06/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26010 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
06/01/1959 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
04/12/1992 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
06/01/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/01/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5310 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26010 |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
05/10/1987 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26010 |
|
|