Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 650 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14056 Week
» 67072 Month
» 186599 Year
» 3213452 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5308 |
12/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26008 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
12/12/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5308 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26008 |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
12/03/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26008 |
|
|
13/07/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|