Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1274 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7058 Week
» 28447 Month
» 147974 Year
» 3174827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5301 |
12/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26001 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
26 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
12/09/1958 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
04/10/1993 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs , 22 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
12/09/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1966 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
by 12/1966 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1966 |
vos |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/06/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5301 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
12/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26001 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26001 |
|
|