Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1565 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28744 Week
» 19800 Month
» 366224 Year
» 3393077 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5285 |
09/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25135 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5285 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25135 |
|
|
16/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25135 |
|
|
08/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|