Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3075 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30254 Week
» 21310 Month
» 367734 Year
» 3394587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5259 |
25/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25109 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
25/03/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
11/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 12/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
03/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5259 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25109 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25109 |
|
|
12/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|